EP0758582 - Laminated glass with a composite layer and a layer for sealing the border as well as the application of special plastics for making such laminated glasses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PILKINGTON Automotive Deutschland GmbH Otto-Seeling-Strasse 7 58455 Witten / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Pilkington Automotive Deutschland GmbH Otto-Seeling-Strasse 7 58455 Witten / DE | ||
Former [1997/08] | For all designated states FLACHGLAS Automotive GmbH Otto-Seeling-Strasse 7 58455 Witten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marquardt, Reinhold, Dr. Robert-Schmidt-Str. 39 45884 Gelsenkirchen / DE | 02 /
Costa, Peter, Dr. Papenholz 34 58455 Witten / DE | [1997/08] | Representative(s) | Honke, Manfred, et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Postfach 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Honke, Manfred, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Partner, Postfach 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1997/08] | Andrejewski, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte, Andrejewski, Honke & Partner, Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96112192.8 | 27.07.1996 | [1997/08] | Priority number, date | DE1995129449 | 10.08.1995 Original published format: DE 19529449 | [1997/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0758582 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0758582 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | [1998/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, C03C27/12 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/10155 (EP);
B32B17/10293 (EP,US);
B32B17/10302 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24231 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24777 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/258 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2817 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2826 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2938 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31518 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31554 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LU, SE [1997/08] | Title | German: | Verbundglasscheibe mit einer Verbundschicht und einer Kantenversiegelungsschicht sowie Verwendung besonderer Kunststoffe für die Herstellung solcher Verbundglasscheiben | [1997/08] | English: | Laminated glass with a composite layer and a layer for sealing the border as well as the application of special plastics for making such laminated glasses | [1997/08] | French: | Verre laminé avec une feuille laminée et une couche pour le scellage des bords ainsi que l'utilisation des matières plastiques spéciales pour la fabrication de tels verres laminés | [1997/08] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 01.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/32] | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0391165 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [DA] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [DA]GB310065 (GEORGE BAKER RILEY) [DA] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE3227647 (VER GLASWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 2 *; | [A]FR2184672 (GLAVERBEL [BE]) [A] 1-15 * claims 10,15 *; | [A]GB1195593 (GULF RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [A] 11-15 * page 4, line 12 - line 26; claim 8 *; | [A]US1818159 (RANDALL JAMES W H); | [A]GB325048 (LOUIS BARTELSTONE) | by applicant | EP0391165 | GB310065 |