EP0756843 - Machine for making beverages such as espresso coffee with automatic ground coffee introduction and dregs expulsion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fianara International B.V. Riverstaete Building, Amsteldijk 166 1079 LH Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states FIANARA INTERNATIONAL B.V. "Rivierstaete" Building, Amsteldijk 166 1079 LH Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states J. LOUGH LIMITED 4, Lower Hatch Street Dublin 2 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmed, Arthur-Joachim Langrütistrasse 87 8635 Oberdürnten / CH | [1997/06] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96112206.6 | 29.07.1996 | [1997/06] | Priority number, date | CH19950002231 | 31.07.1995 Original published format: CH 223195 | [1997/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0756843 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0756843 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
A47J31/3614 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, PT [1997/06] | Title | German: | Maschine zum Bereiten von Getränken sowie Espressokaffee mit automatischer Einfuhr von gemahlenem Kaffee und Abfuhr von ausgelaugten Kaffeekuchen | [1997/06] | English: | Machine for making beverages such as espresso coffee with automatic ground coffee introduction and dregs expulsion | [1997/06] | French: | Machine à faire des boissons tel que le café espresso avec des moyens automatiques pour introduire du café moulu et pour dégager les pastilles infusées | [1997/06] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 27.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3221637 (SMALL SOLLIE W, et al) [A] 1,3 * column 4, line 12 - column 15, line 56; figure - *; | [XA]GB2019202 (VALENTE P, et al) [X] 1-3,5 * page 1, line 73 - page 2, line 112; figure - * [A] 4,8-12; | [A]DE3105124 (WMF WUERTTEMBERG METALLWAREN [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,7,8,12 * page 8, paragraph L - page 26, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [XA]GB2159392 (SANDEN CORP) [X] 1 * page 1, line 129 - page 3, line 82; figures 1-3,6,7 * [A] 3,7,8,12; | [A]WO9319655 (VERSINI ROLLAND [FR]); | [A]DE4329597 (HGZ MASCHINENBAU AG [CH]) |