EP0771821 - Prepolymer for olefin polymerisation combining several solid catalyst components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atofina 4/8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2000/34] |
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malinge, Jean Maison Lasserre 64300 Loubieng / FR | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Leyder, Francis, et al Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Leyder, Francis, et al Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | ||
Former [2002/01] | Leyder, Francis, et al Atofina Research S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle Zone Industrielle C 7181 Feluy / BE | ||
Former [2001/38] | Leyder, Francis, et al Atofina Research S.A. Pat. Dept., Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Application number, filing date | 96112322.1 | 31.07.1996 | [1997/19] | Priority number, date | FR19950010942 | 19.09.1995 Original published format: FR 9510942 | [1997/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0771821 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0771821 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/609 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
Y10S526/901 (EP,US);
Y10S526/904 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/19] | Title | German: | Aus mehreren festen Katalysatorbestandteilen bestehendes Prepolymer für die Olefinpolymerisation | [1997/19] | English: | Prepolymer for olefin polymerisation combining several solid catalyst components | [1997/19] | French: | Prépolymère pour la polymérisation des oléfines, associant plusieurs composantes catalytiques solides | [1997/19] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1996 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 13.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2541683 (ATO CHIMIE [FR]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * claims 1,2,5,10,12 * * page 20, line 26 - page 22, line 4; example 1 *; | [A]EP0562928 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [A] 1 * claim 5 ** example 1 *; | [A]EP0604401 (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 11, line 49 - page 12, line 41; example 1 *; | [PX]EP0673950 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [PX] 1,3,6,7 * page 9, line 44 - page 10, line 40; example 1 * | by applicant | US5032562 | EP0439964 | EP0447070 | FR19860004413 |