EP0758647 - Acyl substituted aminopyrans with a modulating effect on calcium channels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1997/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urbahns, Klaus, Dr. Pahlkestr. 3 42115 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Heine, Hans-Georg, Dr. Am Heckerhof 14 47800 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Junge, Bodo, Dr. Spieckern 23 42399 Wuppertal / DE | 04 /
Mauler, Frank, Dr. Spargarder Str. 8 51491 Overath / DE | 05 /
Wittka, Reilinde, Dr. Heidestr. 21 51069 Köln / DE | 06 /
De Vry, Jean-Marie-Viktor, Dr. Adelenhof 36 51503 Rösrath / DE | [1997/08] | Application number, filing date | 96112426.0 | 01.08.1996 | [1997/08] | Priority number, date | DE1995129859 | 14.08.1995 Original published format: DE 19529859 | [1997/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758647 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758647 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D309/32, A61K31/35 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
C07D309/32 (EP,US);
A61K31/351 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/08] | Title | German: | Acyl-substituierte Aminopyrane mit einer modulierende Wirkung auf Kaliumkanäle | [1997/08] | English: | Acyl substituted aminopyrans with a modulating effect on calcium channels | [1997/08] | French: | Aminopyranes substitués par un groupe acyl modulant le canal à calcium | [1997/08] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 23.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.08.2001 | DK | 01.08.2001 | FI | 01.08.2001 | GB | 01.08.2001 | IE | 01.08.2001 | LU | 01.08.2001 | ES | 02.08.2001 | SE | 02.08.2001 | [2007/29] |
Former [2004/28] | AT | 01.08.2001 | |
DK | 01.08.2001 | ||
FI | 01.08.2001 | ||
GB | 01.08.2001 | ||
IE | 01.08.2001 | ||
ES | 02.08.2001 | ||
SE | 02.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 01.08.2001 | |
DK | 01.08.2001 | ||
FI | 01.08.2001 | ||
GB | 01.08.2001 | ||
IE | 01.08.2001 | ||
SE | 02.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 01.08.2001 | |
FI | 01.08.2001 | ||
GB | 01.08.2001 | ||
IE | 01.08.2001 | ||
SE | 02.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 01.08.2001 | |
GB | 01.08.2001 | ||
IE | 01.08.2001 | ||
SE | 02.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/37] | FI | 01.08.2001 | |
GB | 01.08.2001 | ||
SE | 02.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 01.08.2001 | |
SE | 02.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 02.08.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]GB1402793 (BAYER AG) [DX] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0088276 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [PA]WO9606091 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [PA] 1 * claim 1 * |