EP0760317 - Force limiting device on a seat-belt retractor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 20 73551 Alfdorf / DE | [1998/25] |
Former [1997/10] | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH Industriestrasse 20 73551 Alfdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böhmler, Klaus Seelenbachweg 11 73525 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [1997/10] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/10] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys. Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96112517.6 | 02.08.1996 | [1997/10] | Priority number, date | DE1995213942U | 30.08.1995 Original published format: DE 29513942 U | [1997/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760317 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760317 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/28 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
B60R22/3413 (EP,US);
B60R22/46 (KR);
B60R2022/283 (EP,US);
B60R2022/286 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/10] | Title | German: | Kraftbegrenzer an einem Gurtaufroller für Sicherheitsgurte | [1997/10] | English: | Force limiting device on a seat-belt retractor | [1997/10] | French: | Limiteur de force sur rétracteur de ceinture de sécurité | [1997/10] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 12.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 22.03.2000 | [2002/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2242998 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]) [A] 1,3,5,6 * figure - * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 4, line 18 - page 7, line 2 *; | [A]FR2190016 (KANGOL TEKA SICHERHEITSGURT GM [DE]) [A] 1,3,5,6 * figures 5-7 * * page 1, line 26 - line 32 * * page 3, line 7 - line 24 *; | [A]FR2258199 (KOLB KG HANS [DE]) [A] 1,3,5,6 * figures 19-23 * * page 7, line 32 - page 8, line 16 * * page 16, line 18 - page 18, line 10 *; | [A]FR2273693 (FIAT SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3 * figures 5-8 * * page 1, line 26 - line 30 * * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 17 *; | [PA]WO9605988 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [PA] 1-3 * figures 1-7,9 * * page 2, line 33 - page 7, line 29 * * page 9, line 10 - page 10, line 7 * | by applicant | DE4227781 |