EP0775657 - Device for aligning flat mail objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burgbacher, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Jungerhalde 84 78464 Konstanz / DE | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1997/31] |
Former [1997/22] | Erbacher, Alfons, Dipl.-Ing., et al Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 96112616.6 | 05.08.1996 | [1997/22] | Priority number, date | DE1995128829 | 05.08.1995 Original published format: DE 19528829 | [1997/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0775657 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0775657 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | [1997/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0775657 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B07C1/06, B65H9/16 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
B07C1/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/22] | B65H9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ausrichten von flachen Sendungen | [1997/22] | English: | Device for aligning flat mail objects | [1997/22] | French: | Dispositif pour aligner des objets postaux plats | [1997/22] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 02.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE1817472U (TELEFUNKEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,5 * page 5, line 6 - page 7, line 17; figure - * [Y] 2,3,6; | [YA]EP0431267 (LANDIS & GYR BETRIEBS AG [CH]) [Y] 2,3 * column 5, line 30 - line 52 * * column 10, line 29 - line 55; figures 1,3,6; claim 1 * [A] 1; | [YA]US4836527 (WONG LAM F [US]) [Y] 6 * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 68; figure - * [A] 1 |