EP0764832 - Means for marking a measuring point [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Körner, Hans-Holger Platanenallee 39 23758 Oldenburg/Holstein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states Körner, Hans-Holger Platanenallee 39 23758 Oldenburg in Holstein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Liebherrstrasse 20 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96112738.8 | 07.08.1996 | [1997/13] | Priority number, date | DE1995135281 | 22.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19535281 | [1997/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0764832 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0764832 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/10, G01F1/06 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
G01F1/06 (EP);
G01F1/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/13] | Title | German: | Mengenzähler für fliessfähige Medien | [1997/13] | English: | Means for marking a measuring point | [1997/13] | French: | Compteur pour milieux fluides | [1997/13] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 01.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/37] | 06.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE3415366 (CONGERMANIA MESS & REGEL) [DY] 1-5,8 * page 5, line 28 - page 7, line 36; figure . *; | [Y]EP0512325 (ALLMESS MESS REGELGERAETE) [Y] 1-5 * column 12, line 4 - line 23 * * column 8, line 46 - column 12, line 23; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]FR1058999 (COMPAGNIE POUR LA FABRICATION DES COMPTEURS ET MATÉRIEL D'USINES À GAZ) [Y] 8 * page 1, column R, paragraph 2; figure 2 *; | [PA]EP0682234 (KOERNER HANS HOLGER) [PA] 1 * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]DE3104134 (PAUSCH MANFRED PROF DR) [A] 6 * page 13, line 9 - line 15; figure 2 *; | [A]GB240262 (C.L. STOKOE) [A] 6 * page 3, line 32 - line 40; figure 4 * |