EP0762792 - Call reception control method for digital mobile telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kenwood 2967-3, Ishikawa-cyo Hachiouji-shi Tokyo 192-8525 / JP | [2008/49] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD 14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hori, Hiroyuki 18-22-201 Nakamachi 3-chome Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Masuda, Takashi 38-2-111 Oguchidori, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Serizawa, Gorou 13-8-A203 Ikuta 1-chome, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/11] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96113094.5 | 14.08.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | JP19950243746 | 29.08.1995 Original published format: JP 24374695 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0762792 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0762792 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0762792 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/12 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/11] | H04Q7/38, H04Q7/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/11] | Title | German: | Steuerungsverfahren für Anrufsempfang für digitales mobiles Telefongerät | [1997/11] | English: | Call reception control method for digital mobile telephone | [1997/11] | French: | Méthode de commande de réception d'un appel pour téléphone mobile numérique | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 19.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9507010 (LEIH GEORGE ;LENSINK ANDRE (NL); NEDERLAND PTT (NL); LEVELT WILLEM) [A] 1 * page 1, line 21 - page 2, line 14 * * page 5, line 5 - page 5, line 9 * * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 4 * * page 5, line 17 - page 5, line 27 * * page 9, line 20 - page 10, line 12 * * page 11, line 21 - page 11, line 27 *; | [A]WO9417643 (SAWYER FRANCOIS) [A] 1,3 * page 2, line 15 - page 5, line 2 * |