EP0761808 - Use of substituted lactones as perfuming agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2000 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.2000 [2000/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAARMANN & REIMER GMBH Postfach 12 53 37601 Holzminden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states HAARMANN & REIMER GMBH Postfach 12 53 D-37601 Holzminden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Esser, Peter, Dr. Birkenweg 14 37603 Holzminden / DE | 02 /
Pelzer, Ralf, Dr. Im Schlossgarten 3 37699 Fürstenberg / DE | 03 /
Völkl, Frank 235 West 48th Street New York, NY 10036 / US | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Petrovicki, Wolfgang Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Petrovicki, Wolfgang, Dr. Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96113290.9 | 20.08.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | DE1995132314 | 01.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19532314 | [1997/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0761808 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0761808 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0761808 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C11B9/00, A61K7/46 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
B01J19/127 (EP);
C07D307/32 (EP);
C07D307/60 (EP);
C07D307/83 (EP);
C07D307/89 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/11] | Title | German: | Verwendung substituierter Lactone als Riechstoffe | [1997/11] | English: | Use of substituted lactones as perfuming agent | [1997/11] | French: | Utilisation de lactones substituées comme agent parfumant | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 15.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2211457 (NAARDEN INTERNATIONAL NV [NL]) [A] 1-5 * page 2, lines 22-25; figures 2,3; claim - *; | [A]EP0046542 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-5 * claim - *; | [A]EP0479222 (GIVAUDAN & CIE SA [CH]) [A] 1-5 * claim - *; | [A]DE2509668 (FIRMENICH & CIE) [A] 1-5 * claim - * |