EP0761181 - Device for removing dental scale [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Planert, Jens, Dr. med dent. Elbinger Strasse 1 37083 Göttingen / DE | [1997/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [1997/11] | Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe Am Kirschberge 22 37085 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96113354.3 | 21.08.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | DE1995131062 | 23.08.1995 Original published format: DE 19531062 | [1997/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0761181 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0761181 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61C17/20, A61C17/02 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
A61C19/063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1997/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Zahnbelägen | [1997/11] | English: | Device for removing dental scale | [1997/11] | French: | Dispositif pour enlever le tartre dentaire | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/46] | 23.07.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 12.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/24] | 22.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4208664 (PROPHY-WARE) [A] 1 * column 3, line 20 - line 23; figure - *; | [A]DE3616980 (DOLDERER) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [A]US5013241 (VON GUTFELD ET AL.) [A] 2 * column W *; | [A]JPH0747088 ; | [XP]DE4436490 (DEINLEIN-KALB) [XP] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 095, no. 005, & JP07047088 A 19950221 (MASAO ISODA) [A] 2 * abstract * |