EP0761563 - Dispenser for tablets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RPC Bramlage GmbH Brägeler Strasse 70 49393 Lohne / DE | [1999/18] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states Bramlage GmbH Brägeler Strasse 70 D-49393 Lohne / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schreckenberg, Bernd Lerchentaler Strasse 44 49393 Lohne / DE | 02 /
Südkamp, Ludger Im Heidewinkel 52 49393 Lohne / DE | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Mey, Klaus-Peter Patentanwalt Dr. Mey Aachener Strasse 710 50226 Frechen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Mey, Klaus-Peter, Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing. Patentanwalt Dr. Mey Aachener Strasse 710 50226 Frechen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96113594.4 | 24.08.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | DE19952014137U | 02.09.1995 Original published format: DE 29514137 U | [1997/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0761563 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0761563 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/04 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
B65D83/0409 (EP,US);
A61J1/03 (EP,US);
B65D2583/0481 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/11] | Extension states | AL | 03.09.1996 | LT | 03.09.1996 | LV | 03.09.1996 | SI | 03.09.1996 | Title | German: | Tablettenspender | [1997/11] | English: | Dispenser for tablets | [1997/11] | French: | Distributeur de comprimés | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 01.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.09.1999 | FI | 29.09.1999 | GR | 29.09.1999 | IT | 29.09.1999 | NL | 29.09.1999 | SE | 29.09.1999 | PT | 29.12.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/07] | ES | 29.09.1999 | |
FI | 29.09.1999 | ||
GR | 29.09.1999 | ||
NL | 29.09.1999 | ||
SE | 29.09.1999 | ||
PT | 29.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/09] | ES | 29.09.1999 | |
FI | 29.09.1999 | ||
NL | 29.09.1999 | ||
SE | 29.09.1999 | ||
PT | 29.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 29.09.1999 | |
FI | 29.09.1999 | ||
SE | 29.09.1999 | ||
PT | 29.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | FI | 29.09.1999 | |
SE | 29.09.1999 | ||
PT | 29.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/29] | FI | 29.09.1999 | |
IE | 29.09.1999 | ||
PT | 29.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/17] | IE | 29.09.1999 | |
PT | 29.12.1999 | ||
FI | 30.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/26] | PT | 29.12.1999 | |
FI | 30.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | FI | 30.12.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4696415 (MESHBERG PHILIP [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,7,8 * column 8, line 62 - column 9, line 61; figure 10 *; | [Y]EP0345413 (BRAMLAGE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0408774 (KERPLAS NEUENBURG GMBH KUNSTST [DE]) [A] 4* column 12, lines 23-41; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US5123574 (POULOS JAMES F [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,7,8 * abstract * |