EP0761147 - Wire strand fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hofer, Gernot Bruggenweg 9 6850 Dornbirn / AT | [1997/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Krause, Peter Sagerbachgasse 7 2500 Baden / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Krause, Peter Penzinger Strasse 76 1141 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 96113629.8 | 26.08.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | AT19950001433 | 25.08.1995 Original published format: AT 143395 | [1997/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0761147 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0761147 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47H1/18 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
A47H1/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/11] | Title | German: | Drahtseil-Garnitur | [1997/11] | English: | Wire strand fitting | [1997/11] | French: | Garniture pour câble métallique | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 18.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.05.2001 | GB | 23.05.2001 | IT | 23.05.2001 | CH | 31.08.2001 | LI | 31.08.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 23.05.2001 | |
GB | 23.05.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 23.05.2001 | |
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/18] | GB | 23.05.2001 | |
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/16] | GB | 23.05.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29500981U (M. EHEMEIER) [A] 1 * page 19, line 21 - page 22, line 17; figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE802829 (T. TRIEBENBACHER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2216396 (VIVIAN AU CHAN WAI SAU) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2700482 (W. BÜNGER) [A] 1 * the whole document * |