EP0763415 - Method and apparatus for ejecting injection moulded plastic objects from a mould in a plastic injection moulding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herbst, Richard Freisinger Strasse 3b D-85386 Eching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states HERBST, Richard Freisinger Strasse 3b D-85386 Eching / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Witte, Alexander, et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96113711.4 | 28.08.1996 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | DE1995132969 | 07.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19532969 | [1997/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763415 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/42, B29C45/72 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
B29C45/4225 (EP);
B29C45/7207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entformen von Spritzgegossenen Kunststofferzeugnissen aus einem Werkzeug einer Kunststoff-Spritzgiessmaschine | [1997/12] | English: | Method and apparatus for ejecting injection moulded plastic objects from a mould in a plastic injection moulding machine | [1997/12] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour démouler des objets en matière plastique moulés par injection d'un moule dans une machine à mouler par injection des matières plastiques | [1997/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/34] | 13.02.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]DE4425795 (KRUPP MASCHINENTECHNIK) [PX] 1,4,6,7,9,15-17,19 * the whole document *; | [X]FR1494151 (PETITCOLLIN-MONVILLE) [X] 1,5-7,9,12,15,20 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2610258 (VOITH FISCHER KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK) [A] 1,5,6,20 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0266804 (HUSKY INJECTION MOLDING SYSTEMS) [DA] 1,5,6,20 * figures 11,12; claim - * |