EP0768178 - Process for detecting layers on metallic surfaces in printing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mülheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lippold, Andreas Staubelgasse 3 61130 Nidderau / DE | 02 /
Schlegel, Christian Talstrasse 37 63128 Dietzenbach / DE | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Stahl, Dietmar manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Stahl, Dietmar manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach am Main / DE | ||
Former [1997/16] | Stahl, Dietmar MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Abteilung FTB/S, Postfach 101264 63012 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 96113721.3 | 28.08.1996 | [1997/16] | Priority number, date | DE1995137807 | 11.10.1995 Original published format: DE 19537807 | [1997/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0768178 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0768178 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00, B41F31/04 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
B41F33/0063 (EP,US);
G01B11/06 (EP,US);
Y10S101/45 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Feststellen von Schichten auf metallischen Oberflächen in Druckmaschinen | [1997/16] | English: | Process for detecting layers on metallic surfaces in printing machines | [1997/16] | French: | Procédé de détection des couches sur des surfaces métalliques dans des machines à imprimer | [1997/16] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 17.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.02.1999 | SE | 03.02.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2002/23] | SE | 03.02.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2651003 (G V PLANER LTD) [X] 1,3-5,7 * the whole document * [Y] 2,6; | [Y]US4129781 (DOYLE W [US]) [Y] 2,6* abstract * |