EP0762560 - Electrical connector with embedded terminals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532-1682 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532-1682 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yagi, Masanori 17-5-102 Kokubuminami 3-chome Ebina-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Saitou, Kazunobu 7-32-401 Yamazakidanchi, 2130 Yamazakimachi Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner Patentanwälte, Sonnenberger Strasse 100 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1997/11] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Sonnenberger Strasse 100 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 96113724.7 | 28.08.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | JP19950010434 | 07.09.1995 Original published format: JP 1043495 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0762560 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0762560 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | [1998/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0762560 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/36, H01R13/405, H01R43/24 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
H01R43/24 (EP,US);
H01R9/00 (KR);
H01R12/57 (EP);
H01R12/716 (EP,US);
H01R13/405 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/15] | H01R9/09, H01R13/405, H01R43/24 | ||
Former IPC [1997/11] | H01R23/72 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/11] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Verbinder mit eingebetteten Verbindungsklemmen | [1997/11] | English: | Electrical connector with embedded terminals | [1997/11] | French: | Connecteur électrique à barres de connexion encastrées | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 22.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4795602 (PRETCHEL DAVID A [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,7,8,12,13 * column 5, line 39 - column 7, line 7 * * column 9, line 5 - column 10, line 66 ** figures 1-12 *; | [Y]US5176541 (MORI SATOSHI [JP]) [Y] 1-3,7-10,12,13 * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 16 * * figures 1-8 *; | [Y]US5201883 (ATOH KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,8-10,13 * the whole document *; | [E]EP0693802 (MOLEX INC [US]) [E] 1,4-9,13 * column 5, line 15 - column 7, line 2 * * figures 1-14 * |