EP0763403 - Grinding tool and method and apparatus for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN Winter Diamantwerkzeuge GmbH & Co. KG Schützenwall 13-17 22844 Norderstedt / DE | [2002/18] |
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states ERNST WINTER & SOHN Diamantwerkzeuge GmbH & Co. Schützenwall 13-17 22844 Norderstedt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Hans-Robert, Dr.-Ing. Hollernstr. 109 21723 Hollern-Twielenfleth / DE | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1997/12] | Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96113809.6 | 29.08.1996 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | DE1995133836 | 13.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19533836 | [1997/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763403 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0763403 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B24D5/14, B24D7/14, B24D18/00 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
B24D5/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, SE [1997/12] | Title | German: | Schleifwerkzeug und Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu seiner Herstellung | [1997/12] | English: | Grinding tool and method and apparatus for manufacturing the same | [1997/12] | French: | Outil de meulage et procédé et dispositif pour sa fabrication | [1997/12] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 26.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 27.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4131436 (WIAND RONALD C) [X] 1,2,7-10 * column W *; | [A]EP0355436 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]DE1502649 (OSBORN MFG CO) [A] 1,11-13 * page 27, line 12 - page 28, line 2; figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE8521488U (UKRAINSKIJ NAUCHNO-ISSLEDOVATELSKIJ INSTITUT METALLOV); | [A]CH185483 (BUCHELI GOTTFRIED [CH]) | Examination | US1403416 |