EP0764482 - Method for increasing the thickness of an outer peripheral portion of a metal disc, and method for molding a disc member having a load transmitting portion on the outer periphery thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/13] | Method for increasing thickness of outer peripheral portion of disc, and method for molding disc member having transmitting portion in outer periphery thereof | ||
[2001/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIKIKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-13 Nihonbashihoncho 3-chome, Chuou-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states FUJIKIKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-13 Nihonbashihoncho 3-chome, Chuou-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohya, Masakiyo, Fujikiko K.K. Washizu-kojyo, 2028 Washizu Kosai-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Totsuka, Tamio, Fujikiko K.K. Washizu-kojyo, 2028 Washizu Kosai-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96113959.9 | 30.08.1996 | [1997/13] | Priority number, date | JP19950223911 | 31.08.1995 Original published format: JP 22391195 | [1997/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0764482 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0764482 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B21H5/02, B21D53/28 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
B21H5/02 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49471 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Umfangsdicke einer Metallscheibe und zum Formen eines Kraftübertragungsteils in den Scheibenumfang | [2001/15] | English: | Method for increasing the thickness of an outer peripheral portion of a metal disc, and method for molding a disc member having a load transmitting portion on the outer periphery thereof | [2001/15] | French: | Méthode pour accroître l'épaisseur d'une partie périphérique d'un disque métallique et pour y former une partie périphérique de transmission de force | [2001/15] |
Former [1997/13] | Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Umfangsdicke einer Scheibe und zum Formen eines Kraftübertragungsteil in den Scheibenumfang | ||
Former [1997/13] | Method for increasing thickness of outer peripheral portion of disc, and method for molding disc member having transmitting portion in outer periphery thereof | ||
Former [1997/13] | Méthode pour accroître l'épaisseur d'une partie périphérique d'un disque et pour y former une partie périphérique de transmission | Examination procedure | 30.08.1996 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 22.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 14.03.2000 | Observations by third parties | 27.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3917925 (LEIFELD & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-9 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0397901 (LEIFELD GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,6,9 * column W *; | [A]DE4314558 (LEIFELD GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1; | [A]EP0555631 (WF MASCHINENBAU BLECHFORMTECH [DE]) [A] 1 | other | EP0397901 | DE19581538T | US5152061 | DE3917925 |