EP0827351 - Method and apparatus for message numbering in a paging network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1999 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.1999 [1999/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Erika Köchler Fälmisstrasse 21 CH-8833 Samstagern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states FIRMA ERIKA KÖCHLER Fälmisstrasse 21 CH-8833 Samstagern / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lax, Alexander Peter Landsdown Close, College Road Bath BA1 5RR / GB | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil, et al E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst, et al c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 96113970.6 | 31.08.1996 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0827351 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/10 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
H04W88/185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1998/47] |
Former [1998/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Nachrichtennumerierung in einen Funkrufsystem | [1998/10] | English: | Method and apparatus for message numbering in a paging network | [1998/10] | French: | Procédé et appareil de numération des messages dans un réseau d'appel selectif | [1998/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/24] | 19.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.10.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0496623 (NEC CORPORATION) [A] 1,3,4,8,10 * column 3, line 56 - column 8, line 1 *; | [A]WO9408420 (MOTOROLA, INC.) [A] 1,3,4,8,10 * page 9, line 37 - page 13, line 14 * * figure 2 * | [A] - EDBOM G, "THE CONCEPT FOR WORLD WIDE RADIO PAGING", 41ST IEEE VEHICLULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. GATEWAY TO THE FUTURE - TECHNOLOGY IN MOTION, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, 19-22 MAY 1991, pages 840 - 847, XP000260286 [A] 1-3,5,8-10 * page 844, column L, line 15 - column R, line 22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1991.140614 |