EP0829677 - Lighting fixture for humid environments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siteco Beleuchtungstechnik GmbH Ohmstrasse 50 83301 Traunreut / DE | [1998/40] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states Siemens Beleuchtungstechnik GmbH & Co. KG Ohmstrasse 50 83301 Traunreut / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brüggemann, Jürgen Berlinerstr. 311 83301 Traunreut / DE | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96114911.9 | 17.09.1996 | [1998/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0829677 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0829677 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F21V17/00, F21V31/00 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
F21V17/164 (EP,US);
F21V15/01 (EP);
F21V17/104 (EP);
F21V17/16 (EP);
F21V31/00 (EP);
F21Y2103/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1998/49] |
Former [1998/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Feuchtraumleuchte | [1998/12] | English: | Lighting fixture for humid environments | [1998/12] | French: | Armature lumineuse pour locaux humides | [1998/12] | Examination procedure | 13.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 20.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 12.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 28.08.2002 | CH | 30.09.2002 | LI | 30.09.2002 | [2003/40] |
Former [2003/22] | NL | 28.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3389249 (RACKLEY CARLE E) [A] 1* figure 2 *; | [A]DE1298422 (RUDOLF ZIMMERMANN OHG) [A] 1,4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1589344 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1,2,4,5 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 6 * * page 6, lines 7-11; figures 1,2,8 * |