EP0770416 - Coolant filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ing. Walter Hengst GmbH & Co. KG Nienkamp 75 48147 Münster / DE | [2001/47] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Ing. Walter Hengst GmbH & Co. KG Nienkamp 75 D-48147 Münster / DE | ||
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states Ing. Walter Hengst GmbH & Co. KG Nienkamp 75 D-48147 Münster / DE | ||
For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states Ing. Walter Hengst GmbH & Co. KG Nienkamp 75 D-48147 Münster / DE | ||
For all designated states DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states Ing. Walter Hengst GmbH & Co. KG Nienkamp 75 D-48147 Münster / DE | ||
For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Postfach 60 02 02 70322 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumann, Dieter Überwasserstrasse 10 48268 Greven-Gimbte / DE | 02 /
Batram, Bernhard Am Schienenweg 9 48268 Greven / DE | 03 /
Homberger, Jörg Feldspatweg 6 73760 Ostfildern / DE | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Schulze Horn & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 20 20 05 48101 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Schulze Horn & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Goldstrasse 50 48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 96114928.3 | 18.09.1996 | [1997/18] | Priority number, date | DE1995140251 | 28.10.1995 Original published format: DE 19540251 | [1997/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0770416 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0770416 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01D37/02, F01P11/06 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
F01P11/06 (EP,US);
B01D27/06 (EP,US);
B01D27/08 (EP,US);
B01D29/21 (EP,US);
B01D29/96 (EP,US);
B01D37/025 (EP,US);
B01D2201/0415 (EP,US);
B01D2201/305 (EP,US);
B01D2201/4084 (EP,US);
F01P2011/065 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1997/18] | Title | German: | Kühlmittelfilter | [1997/18] | English: | Coolant filter | [1997/18] | French: | Filtre d'agent refroidisseur | [1997/18] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 17.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4259184 (D ARNAL HUBERT A) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4265748 (VILLANI FRANCO, et al) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0501851 (FLEETGUARD [FR]) [A] 1* figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US5435346 (TREGIDGO JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |