EP0764604 - Drive device for a folder in a printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goss Graphic Systems, Inc. 700 Oakmont Lane Westmont Illinois 60554-5546 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states Goss Graphic Systems, Inc. 700 Oakmont Lane Westmont, Illinois 60554-5546 / US | ||
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 1431 Opus Place Downers Grove, Illinois 60515 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomczak, Charles 816 Muirhead Avenue Naperville, Illinois 60565 / US | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Lippich, Wolfgang, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Lippich, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Pys., Dr.rer.nat., et al Patentanwalt Samson & Partner, Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/01] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1997/13] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96114947.3 | 18.09.1996 | [1997/13] | Priority number, date | US19950530559 | 19.09.1995 Original published format: US 530559 | [1997/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0764604 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0764604 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0764604 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/16 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
B65H45/161 (EP,US);
B65H45/168 (EP,US);
B65H2403/40 (EP,US);
B65H2511/414 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/414, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/13] | Title | German: | Antriebsvorrichtung für eine Falzmaschine in einer Druckmaschine | [1997/13] | English: | Drive device for a folder in a printing press | [1997/13] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement pour une machine de pliage dans une machine à imprimer | [1997/13] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 20.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.1999 | 30.09.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3865361 (NEAL FRANK) [X] 1-5 * column 8, line 60 - column 10, line 26; figures 1B,7-9 *; | [X]US3517920 (SNYDER ROBERT A) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 8; figure - *; | [A]US3038719 (TYMA JR LOUIS S) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 49; figure - *; | [A]US4273320 (FUJISHIRO YUJI) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 49 - column 5, line 53; figure - * |