EP0788193 - Electric connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwahori, Yoshihiro, c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 206-1, Nunobikibara, Haibara-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-04 / JP | 02 /
Uchida, Yoshinori, c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 206-1, Nunobikibara, Haibara-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-04 / JP | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96115138.8 | 20.09.1996 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | JP19950243195 | 21.09.1995 Original published format: JP 24319595 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0788193 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0788193 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0788193 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/629 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
H01R13/641 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/32] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Verbinder | [1997/32] | English: | Electric connector | [1997/32] | French: | Connecteur électrique | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 14.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.12.2000 | FR | 13.12.2000 | IT | 13.12.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 13.12.2000 | |
FR | 13.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 13.12.2000 | |
FR | 11.05.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | FR | 11.05.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4946395 (COPE KENNETH P [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 11; figures 2,4-6 * [A] 3-5; | [XA]US4634204 (DETTER GARY C [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 17; figures 1-3 * [A] 3-5; | [XA]US5348493 (POWER MICHAEL M [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 34; figures 1-3 * [A] 3-5; | [XA]US4708413 (SCHROEDER DIANE M [US]) [X] 1 * column 7, line 34 - column 8, line 66; figures 7-11 * [A] 2-5; | [A]US5120255 (KOUDA TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 38 - column 5, line 24; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0655807 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 6, line 37 - column 7, line 50; figures 11-14 * |