EP0770871 - Use of temperature control devices in miniaturized planar column devices and miniaturized total analysis systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaltenbach, Patrick Altersbergstrasse 1 76476 Bischweier / DE | 02 /
Swedberg, Sally A. 4546 El Camino Real, No. B363 Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 03 /
Witt, Klaus E. Quellenstrasse 16 76210 Keltern / DE | 04 /
Bek, Fritz Daimlerstrasse 1 76337 Waldbronn / DE | 05 /
Mittelstadt, Laurie S. 2355 Lyall Way Belmont, CA 94002 / US | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, P.O. Box 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96115322.8 | 24.09.1996 | [1997/18] | Priority number, date | US19950546629 | 23.10.1995 Original published format: US 546629 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0770871 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0770871 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/30, G01N30/60, B01L3/00 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
B01L3/5027 (EP,US);
B01L3/502707 (EP,US);
B01L7/525 (EP,US);
B01L7/54 (EP,US);
G01N27/44708 (EP,US);
G01N27/44773 (EP,US);
G01N27/44791 (EP,US);
G01N30/6095 (EP,US);
B01L2200/025 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0689 (EP,US);
B01L2200/10 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/087 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0874 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0883 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0887 (EP,US);
B01L2300/12 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1822 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0415 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0421 (EP,US);
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
B01L3/5055 (EP,US);
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C66/54 (EP,US);
B29C66/549 (EP,US);
G01N2030/285 (EP,US);
G01N2030/3007 (EP,US);
G01N2030/3015 (EP,US);
G01N2030/303 (EP,US);
G01N27/44721 (EP,US);
G01N30/02 (EP,US);
G01N30/60 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
G01N30/02, G01N2030/0035 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/18] | G01N30/30, G01N30/60 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, SE [1997/18] | Title | German: | Gebrauch von Temperaturregelvorrichtungen in miniaturisierten ebenen Kolonnenvorrichtungen und miniaturisiertes vollständiges Analysesystem | [1997/18] | English: | Use of temperature control devices in miniaturized planar column devices and miniaturized total analysis systems | [1997/18] | French: | Utilisage d'un système de contrôle de température dans des dispositifs de colonne aplatie miniaturisés et systèmes de mésure miniaturisés | [1997/18] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/20] | 19.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9421372 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * page 1, lines 5-13 * * page 5, lines 5-26 * * page 6, line 25 * * page 7, lines 29-30 * * page 12, lines 1-17 * * page 13, lines 1-11 * * page 17, lines 7-10 * * page 17, lines 21-22 * * page 18, lines 7-10 * * page 23, line 20 - page 24, line 12 *; | [A]US4935040 (GOEDERT MICHEL G [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, lines 5-7 * * column 2, lines 20-54 * * column 4, lines 10-19 * * column 5, lines 13-20 * * column 6, lines 2-9 *; | [A]US4551251 (KOLOBOW THEODOR [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 3, lines 39-66 * * column 5, lines 52-62 *; | [A]WO9214132 (PHARMACIA BIOSENSOR AB [SE]) [A] 1-4 * page 6, lines 11-18 *; | [A]JPS61288154 ; | [A]US4998433 (STUMPF DAVID K [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 43 *; | [A]US5376252 (EKSTROEM BJOERN [SE], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, lines 3-41 * * column 3, lines 21-39 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 31 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 7 * * column 6, lines 20-30 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870519), vol. 011, no. 153, Database accession no. (P - 577), & JP61288154 A 19861218 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |