EP0768733 - Electrical connector with sliding actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2000 [2000/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jaklin, Ralf Alt-Niederhofheim 65 65835 Liederbach / DE | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion Tyco Electronics Logistics AG Ampèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion AMP International Enterprises Limited Ampèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach (SG) / CH | Application number, filing date | 96115726.0 | 01.10.1996 | [1997/16] | Priority number, date | DE1995137886 | 11.10.1995 Original published format: DE 19537886 | [1997/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0768733 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0768733 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | [1999/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/629 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
H01R13/62977 (EP,US);
H01R13/62911 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/16] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Stecker mit einem Betätigungsschieber | [1997/16] | English: | Electrical connector with sliding actuator | [1997/16] | French: | Connecteur électrique ayant un coulisseau de commande | [1997/16] | Examination procedure | 04.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/19] | 20.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.10.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0606151 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * column 7, line 22 - column 9, line 17 * * column 9, line 38 - column 12, line 3 *; | [X]EP0646992 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [X] 1,3,6,7 * column 4, line 14 - line 17 * * column 6, line 14 - line 19 * * figures 4,6 *; | [X]JPH06275337 (YAZAKI CORP) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | US5476390 [ ] (TAGUCHI NAOTO [JP], et al) [ ] * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 18; figures 11-13 * |