EP0836286 - Circuit arrangement for acquiring a supply voltage from a bus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zierhut, Hermann, Dipl.-Ing. Regentalweg 7 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [1998/16] | Application number, filing date | 96115859.9 | 02.10.1996 | [1998/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0836286 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0836286 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/54, H04L25/02 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
H04B3/548 (EP);
H04L25/02 (EP);
H04B2203/5445 (EP);
H04B2203/547 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [1999/01] |
Former [1998/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Gewinnung einer Versorgungsspannung aus einer Busleitung | [1998/16] | English: | Circuit arrangement for acquiring a supply voltage from a bus | [1998/16] | French: | Montage d'acquisition d'une tension d'alimentation depuis un bus | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 13.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.10.2003 | LI | 31.10.2003 | [2004/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4424907 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * Zusammenfassung *; column 1, line 1 - line 46 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 41 * * column 3, line 68 - column 5, line 9 * * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 13 * * claims 1,4 * * figures 2,5 *; | [A]WO9604735 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * Zusammenfassung *; page 1, line 8 - page 2, line 6 * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 28 * * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 22 * * claims 1,2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2596596 (BENDIX ELECTRONICS SA) [A] 1 * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 4 * * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 17 * * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 32 * * page 9, line 4 - line 14 * * claims 1-4 * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0448881 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT INT) [A] 1 * Zusammenfassung *; column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 42 * * claims 1-3 * * figures 2,3A,3B * |