EP0768641 - Manufacturing method of magnetic head apparatus with spin valve effect magnetoresistive head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uno, Yasufumi 1708-2, Oaza Usuda, Usuda-machi Minamisaku-gun, Nagano / JP | 02 /
Miyauchi, Daisuke 3-25-11, Akatzutsumi Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Matsuzaki, Mikio 2-22-9, Bessho Urawa-shi, Saitama / JP | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Knoblauch, Andreas, Dr.-Ing., et al Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1997/16] | Knoblauch, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch, Kühhornshofweg 10 60320 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 96115884.7 | 04.10.1996 | [1997/16] | Priority number, date | JP19950286391 | 09.10.1995 Original published format: JP 28639195 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0768641 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/39 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
G11B5/3903 (EP,US);
G11B5/3932 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49034 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1997/16] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für ein Magnetkopfgerät mit magnetoresistivem Kopf mit Spinventil-Effekt | [1997/16] | English: | Manufacturing method of magnetic head apparatus with spin valve effect magnetoresistive head | [1997/16] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un appareil à tête magnétique avec tête magnétorésistif à effet spin-valve | [1997/16] | Examination procedure | 23.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 15.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/06] | 04.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH087235 ; | [XP]EP0687917 (IBM [US]) [XP] 1-8 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 20 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 14 * * column 8, line 1 - column 10, line 1 * * column 12, line 23 - line 36 * * figure 5 *; | [Y]US5385637 (THAYAMBALLI PRADEEP K [US]) [Y] 1,3,5,6 * the whole document *; | [YA]US4103315 (HEMPSTEAD ROBERT DOUGLAS, et al) [Y] 1,3,5,6 * the whole document * [A] 2,4,7-9; | [A]EP0585009 (IBM [US]) [A] 1 * column 8, line 9 - column 9, line 17 * * figure 9 *; | [XP]US5549978 (IWASAKI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [XP] 1,3,6 * figure 63 * * column 50, line 36 - column 52, line 10 *; | [XP]EP0694788 (IBM [US]) [XP] 1-6 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 16 * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 33 * * column 8, line 54 - column 12, line 21 * * figures 5,6 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 11, Database accession no. 96-031918, XP002021523 & JPH087235 A 19960112 (IBM CORP) [X] 1-8 * abstract * |