EP0768271 - Winding apparatus for a continuously running thread [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEORG SAHM GMBH & CO. KG Sudetenlandstrasse 33 D-37269 Eschwege / DE | [1997/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rom, Jürgen Auf dem Sperlingsberg 1 37276 Meinhard / DE | 02 /
Bamberg, Jörg Mauerstrasse 44 37269 Eschwege / DE | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [1997/16] | Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe Am Kirschberge 22 37085 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96116021.5 | 07.10.1996 | [1997/16] | Priority number, date | DE1995138480 | 16.10.1995 Original published format: DE 19538480 | [1997/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0768271 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0768271 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0768271 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65H67/048, B65H54/52 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
B65H54/52 (EP,KR,US);
B65H61/005 (KR);
B65H67/048 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2511/212 (EP,US);
B65H2513/11 (KR);
B65H2557/24 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/16] | Title | German: | Spulmaschine für einen kontinuierlich auflaufenden Faden | [1997/16] | English: | Winding apparatus for a continuously running thread | [1997/16] | French: | Bobinoir pour un fil en déplacement continu | [1997/16] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 07.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]JPH08290870 ; | [A]DE3810365 (SCHLAFHORST & CO W [DE]); | [A]DE3911854 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figure -; claims 1-3 *; | [DA]EP0374536 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5407143 (NAKAI SHOJI [JP], et al); | [PX]DE4423491 (NEUMAG GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 097, no. 003, & JP08290870 A 19961105 (MURATA MACH LTD) [E] 1-10 * abstract * |