EP0836342 - Method for neighbourhood relation determination and/or neighbourhood planning of base stations in a cellular radio network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T-Mobile Deutschland GmbH Landgrabenweg 151 53227 Bonn / DE | [2002/30] |
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states DeTeMobil Deutsche Telekom MobilNet GmbH Landgrabenweg 151 53227 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfeiffer, Bernd, Dr. An der Strunde 19 51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 96116372.2 | 11.10.1996 | [1998/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0836342 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0836342 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/36 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
H04W16/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [2000/11] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, CH, FR, GB, NL, SE | ||
Former [1998/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Nachbarschaftsbetrachtung und/oder Nachbarschaftsplanung von Feststationen eines zellularen Funknetzes | [1998/16] | English: | Method for neighbourhood relation determination and/or neighbourhood planning of base stations in a cellular radio network | [1998/16] | French: | Méthode de détermination des relations de voisinage et/ou de planification de voisinage de stations de base dans un réseau radio cellulaire | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1996 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9010342 (TELEVERKET [SE]) [X] 1-3 * page 6, line 21 - page 14, line 1 *; | [X] - GILL T M, "AN AUTOMATED SYSTEM FOR FREQUENCY PLANNING OF CELLULAR RADIO NETWORKS", FOURTH IEE CONFERENCE ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS, MANCHESTER, GB, 18 - 21 APRIL 1993, pages 1 - 5, XP000473691 [X] 1-3,8-10 * page 1, column R, line 20 - page 3, column L, line 33 * | [A] - ANTON M D ET AL, "AN ADAPTIVE METHOD TO LEARN THE COMPATIBILITY MATRIX FOR MICROCELLULAR SYSTEMS", VTC 1994,"CREATING TOMORROW'S MOBILE SYSTEMS". 1994 IEEE 44TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, STOCKHOLM, SE, 8 - 10 JUNE 1994, vol. 2, pages 848 - 852, XP000496796 [A] 1-3,8 * page 848, column R, line 11 - line 21 * * page 849, column L, line 23 - column R, line 27 * |