EP0779411 - Valve driving device for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarzenthal, Dietmar Lenzhalde 5 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 02 /
Grünberger, Joachim Lindenstrasse 20 74343 Sachsenheim / DE | [1997/25] | Application number, filing date | 96116552.9 | 16.10.1996 | [1997/25] | Priority number, date | DE1995146437 | 13.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19546437 | DE1996122174 | 01.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19622174 | [1997/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0779411 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0779411 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F01L13/00, F01L1/26 | [1997/25] | CPC: |
F01L1/14 (KR);
F01L1/143 (EP);
F01L1/267 (EP);
F01L13/0036 (EP);
F01L1/18 (KR);
F01L1/462 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/25] | Title | German: | Ventiltrieb einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1997/25] | English: | Valve driving device for an internal combustion engine | [1997/25] | French: | Commande de soupape pour moteur à combustion interne | [1997/25] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 15.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5203289 (HARA SEINOSUKE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,11,14,15,18 * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 22; figures 21-31 * [A] 5,6; | [A]GB2162246 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE4405189 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0515520 | DE4405189 | DE3735156 |