EP0770321 - Device for locating the position of asparagus plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haindl, Leopold jun. 2282 Markgrafneusiedl 15 / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states Haindl, Leopold jun. # 2282 Markgrafneusiedl 15 / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Hofinger, Engelbert, et al Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Hofinger, Engelbert, DDr., et al Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 96116737.6 | 18.10.1996 | [1997/18] | Priority number, date | AT19950000579U | 23.10.1995 Original published format: AT 57995 U | [1997/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0770321 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0770321 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A01D45/00 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
A01D45/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GR, NL [1997/18] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Feststellung der Position von Spargelpflanzen | [1997/18] | English: | Device for locating the position of asparagus plants | [1997/18] | French: | Dispositif pour déterminer la position des plantes d'asperges | [1997/18] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 17.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2690043 (MARIHART); | [DA]EP0053994 (ENSERB ECOLE NAT SUPERIEURE EL [FR]) [DA] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0157678 (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR]); | [A]DE3415202 (ALLBACH GERD DR MED); | [A]DE4319085 (BOECKENHOFF BERNHARD [DE]); | [A]DE4411080 (HILKER ANDREAS [DE]) |