EP0773052 - Radially traversed ring filter element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE Filtersysteme GmbH Pragstrasse 54 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/03] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH Pragstrasse 54 D-70376 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gebert, Hans Eduard-Bader-Str. 21 74080 Heilbronn / DE | 02 /
Schneider, Horst Bangertstr. 50 71336 Waiblingen / DE | 03 /
Waibel, Hans Bachstelzenstr. 20A 70378 Stuttgart / DE | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft Rotermund + Pfusch Waiblinger Strasse 11 70372 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96116828.3 | 19.10.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | DE1995141385 | 07.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19541385 | [1997/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0773052 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773052 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/21 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
B01D29/111 (EP);
B01D29/21 (EP);
B01D2201/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1997/20] | Title | German: | Radial durchströmbares Ringfilterelement | [1997/20] | English: | Radially traversed ring filter element | [1997/20] | French: | Elément filtrant annulaire traversé radialement | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/31] | 26.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.09.2002 | GB | 18.09.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/21] | GB | 18.09.2002 | |
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | ES | 28.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0548523 (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0441045 (GOBLIN LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * figures 1,6; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US3516549 (MACDONNELL ROBERT W) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 9 - line 24; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0650751 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,1A; claims 1-3,8 *; | [D]DE4428139 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) | by applicant | DE4428139 |