EP0770928 - Copier apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isemura, Keizo, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2,Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/18] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117029.7 | 23.10.1996 | [1997/18] | Priority number, date | JP19950275767 | 24.10.1995 Original published format: JP 27576795 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0770928 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0770928 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0770928 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00, H04N1/387 | [1997/30] | CPC: |
G03G15/5095 (EP,US);
G03G15/607 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00329 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/18] | G03G15/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/18] | Title | German: | Kopiergerät | [1997/18] | English: | Copier apparatus | [1997/18] | French: | Appareil à copier | [1997/18] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 26.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.06.2002 | GB | 23.10.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 23.10.2002 | |
FR | 24.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | FR | 24.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5237379 (SKLUT ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5287159 (SAKAKIBARA KENJI [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4647189 (FUJIWARA KATSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5130757 (ITO MASAZUMI [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4316809 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9422264 (RICOH KK [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4897695 (ITO MASAZUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5311259 (MORIYA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 17 *; | [A]DE3537012 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]) [A] 1 * page 25, line 35 - page 26, line 13; claim 1 *; | [A]US5036354 (MIYAMOTO HIROHISA [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 9A,B *; | [A]GB2237886 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 11 *; | [PA]US5500725 (TAKASU AKIRA [JP], et al) [PA] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4939553 |