EP0773144 - Air bag for a vehicle occupant restraint system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 20 73551 Alfdorf / DE | [1998/25] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH Industriestrasse 20 73551 Alfdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richter, Thomas Weichselstrasse 7 73529 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | 02 /
Acker, Dominique Rechbergstrasse 7 73553 Alfdorf / DE | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/20] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys. Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117074.3 | 24.10.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | DE1995217951U | 13.11.1995 Original published format: DE 29517951 U | [1997/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0773144 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773144 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/22 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
B60R21/231 (EP,US);
B60R21/23138 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23576 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/20] | Title | German: | Gassack für ein Fahrzeuginsassen-Rückhaltesystem | [1997/20] | English: | Air bag for a vehicle occupant restraint system | [1997/20] | French: | Sac gonflable pour un système de retenue des passagers d'un véhicule | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 19.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 29.03.2000 | [2002/29] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4405927 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2283463 (TAKATA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * column A; figure 1 * * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 13; figures 11-13 *; | [A]JPH05238347 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931220), vol. 017, no. 697, Database accession no. (M - 1532), & JP05238347 A 19930917 (IKEDA BUSSAN CO LTD) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * |