EP0771024 - Borderless contact etch process with sidewall spacer and selective isotropic etch process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peschke, Matthias L. Roederstrasse 29 01458 Ottendorf-Okrilla / DE | 02 /
Gambino, Jeffrey 12 Webatuck Road Gaylordsville, CT 06755 / DE | 03 /
Ryan, James Gardner 100 Boggs Hill Road Newtown, CT 06470 / US | 04 /
Stengl, Reinhard Johannes Bergstrasse 3 86391 Stadtbergen / DE | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Zedlitz, Peter, et al OSRAM GmbH Intellectual Property IP Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | Zedlitz, Peter, et al Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/27] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/18] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117199.8 | 25.10.1996 | [1997/18] | Priority number, date | US19950549884 | 27.10.1995 Original published format: US 549884 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0771024 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0771024 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
H01L21/76816 (EP,US);
G03F7/26 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/18] | Title | German: | Ätzverfahren zur Herstellung von randlosen Kontakten mit Seitenwand-Abstandsstücken und selektiver Ätzprozess | [1997/18] | English: | Borderless contact etch process with sidewall spacer and selective isotropic etch process | [1997/18] | French: | Procédé de gravure pour fabriquer des contacts sans bordures utilisant des espaceurs de parois latérales et procédé de gravure sélective | [1997/18] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 13.10.2000 | [2002/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4975381 (TAKA SHIN-ICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,12-20 * figures 1A-1R; claim 1 * * column 4, line 21 - column 7, line 30 *; | [A]EP0540276 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1,2 * figures 3-9 * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 42 *; | [AP]US5529956 (MORISHITA YASUYUKI [JP]) [AP] 1-5,12-16 * figures 1C-1G; claims 1-3 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 30 * |