EP0781005 - Preemptive roaming in a cellular local area wireless network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, Inc. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742-1300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, Inc. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville New York 11742-1300 / US | ||
Former [1997/26] | For all designated states SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, New York 11742-1300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pinard, Patrick 2232 DePaul Place Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 02 /
Heiman, Frederic 16500 Woodacres Road Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | [1997/26] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/26] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117282.2 | 28.10.1996 | [1997/26] | Priority number, date | US19950549051 | 27.10.1995 Original published format: US 549051 | [1997/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0781005 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0781005 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [1997/26] | CPC: |
H04W48/20 (EP,US);
G06K17/0022 (EP,US);
G06K7/0008 (EP,US);
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04B1/713 (EP,US);
H04B1/7156 (EP,US);
H04L5/1484 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04B2001/71563 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/26] | Title | German: | Preemptive Bewegung in einem zellularen drahtlosen lokalen Netz | [1997/26] | English: | Preemptive roaming in a cellular local area wireless network | [1997/26] | French: | Vagabondage préemptif dans un réseau local cellulaire sans fils | [1997/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 12.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.11.2008 | BE | 19.11.2008 | DK | 19.11.2008 | FI | 19.11.2008 | IT | 19.11.2008 | NL | 19.11.2008 | SE | 19.02.2009 | ES | 01.03.2009 | PT | 20.04.2009 | [2011/28] |
Former [2010/05] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 01.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0268375 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [X] 1,3,4,10-14 * column 2, line 25 - line 37 * * column 4, line 2 - line 48 * * column 11, line 56 - column 12, line 9 * * column 12, line 40 - line 47 * [A] 2,5-9; | [XAY]EP0483544 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-14 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 14 * * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 26 * * column 9, line 4 - column 10, line 26 * * column 11, line 10 - column 12, line 24 * [A] 5 [Y] 9; | [A]WO9301663 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-3,5-14 * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 11 * * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 18 *; | [Y]EP0578374 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [Y] 9 * page 3, line 3 - line 24 * * page 3, line 42 - line 44 * * page 4, line 7 - line 14 * * page 4, line 35 - line 46 * * page 5, line 1 - line 15 * * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 54 * * figure 2B *; | [XA]US5448569 (HUANG CHIA-CHI [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-14 * column 1, line 54 - line 68 * * column 2, line 34 - line 43 * * column 3, line 37 - line 56 * * column 4, line 17 - line 60 * * column 5, line 6 - line 62 * * column 6, line 24 - line 60 * * column 7, line 35 - line 52 * * column 9, line 59 - column 10, line 24 * * column 11, line 13 - line 52 * [A] 5,9; | [A] - EDWIN TURNER, "Communications Technology for the Retail Environment", ICL TECHNICAL JOURNAL, OXFORD, GB, (199211), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 272 - 283, XP000320461 [A] * the whole document * | by applicant | US5029183 | US5142550 | US5276680 | US5296842 | US19940193069 | US19930044648 | US19940344737 |