EP0774687 - Solid processing composition and method for processing silver halide photographic light-sensitive material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishio, Shoji c/o Konica Corpotation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117321.8 | 29.10.1996 | [1997/21] | Priority number, date | JP19950281649 | 30.10.1995 Original published format: JP 28164995 | [1997/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0774687 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0774687 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03C5/26, G03C1/06, G03C5/31 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
G03C5/265 (EP,US);
G03C1/061 (EP,US);
G03C5/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/21] | Title | German: | Feste Verarbeitungszusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Verarbeitung eines photographischen, lichtempfindlichen Silberhalogenidmaterials | [1997/21] | English: | Solid processing composition and method for processing silver halide photographic light-sensitive material | [1997/21] | French: | Composition solide pour le traitement de matériaux photographiques et procédé de traitement de matériaux photographiques à l'halogénure d'argent | [1997/21] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 11.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 15.09.2004 | IT | 15.09.2004 | NL | 15.09.2004 | DE | 03.05.2005 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/32] | FR | 15.09.2004 | |
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DE | 03.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | NL | 15.09.2004 | |
DE | 03.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/03] | DE | 03.05.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2685515 (WILSON CHARLES V) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 57 - line 67; examples 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]US2688549 (JAMES THOMAS H, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 8, line 27 - line 37; examples 4-6 *; | [X]US2688548 (REYNOLDS GEORGE A) [X] 1,2 * column 7, line 39 - line 49; examples 1-3; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0461783 (KNAPP AUDENRIED W [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 6, line 11 - line 19; example 1 *; | [X]US5098819 (KNAPP AUDENRIED W [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 7, line 42 - line 50; example 2 *; | [A]WO9311456 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 4,6,8,9 * claims 1,4 *; | [A]EP0573700 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 7* claim 2 *; | [A]US5298372 (OKUTSU EIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * column 8, line 43 - line 59 * * column 1, line 58 - line 63; tables 2-5 * | by applicant | JPS4745541B | US1623499 | US2394025 | GB1038029 | US3320069 | US3342605 | GB1121174 | US3425835 | US3469987 | US3482981 | US3485634 | US3508947 | US3585195 | US3636374 | GB1271329 | US3658546 | US3660101 | US3772031 | JPS5071324 | US4425425 | US4425426 | JPS60150046 | JPH0220852 | JPH0220853 | JPH0220854 | JPH0220855 | JPH0485535 | WO9311456 | US5236816 | JPH05289219 | US5264337 | US5314798 | US5320938 | US5320958 | JPH08220703 | - JAMES T.H., The Theory of the Photographic Process., MCMILLAN CO. LTD., (1966), pages 36 - 43 | - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE., (197812), vol. 176, no. 043, pages 22 - 23 | - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE., (197812), vol. 176, no. 043, pages 23 - 24 | - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE., (1993), vol. 346, no. 086 | - HANSCH C., JOURNAL OF MEDICAL CHEMISTRY., (1977), vol. 20, page 304 | - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE., (197812), vol. 176, no. 043, page 26 | - APPLICATION CONTAINS STILL MORE REFERENCES |