EP0757515 - Control circuit for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states Hella KG Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klassen, Eugen Helfkamp 25 59556 Lippstadt / DE | 02 /
Raulf, Manfred Zur Alten Kirche 59581 Warstein / DE | 03 /
Rehberg, Helmut Grimmestrasse 27 59555 Lippstadt / DE | [1997/06] | Application number, filing date | 96117381.2 | 03.08.1994 | [1997/06] | Priority number, date | DE19934327766 | 18.08.1993 Original published format: DE 4327766 | [1997/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0757515 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0757515 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | [1997/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0757515 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
H05K1/0218 (EP);
H05K1/0225 (EP);
H05K1/0231 (EP);
H05K1/0239 (EP);
H05K9/0039 (EP);
H05K1/0219 (EP);
H05K2201/0715 (EP);
H05K2201/093 (EP);
H05K2201/09663 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/06] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1997/06] | English: | Control circuit for vehicle | [1997/06] | French: | Circuit de commande pour véhicule | [1997/06] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 11.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94112087.5 / EP0639940 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4831498 (BABA YOSHIHIKO [JP]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 18 - line 60; figure 4 * * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 25; figure 8 * [A] 2-8; | [A]US5014160 (MCCOY JR JOHN F [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 39 - column 5, line 11; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE8309875U (DEUTSCHE ITT INDUSTRIES GMBH) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 21; figure 2 * | by applicant | DE4000286 |