EP0773645 - Method for selecting concatenated signals of a received signal of SDH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Horst, Dipl.-Ing. Dammstr. 11 82069 Hohenschäftlarn / DE | [1997/20] | Application number, filing date | 96117438.0 | 30.10.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | DE1995142230 | 13.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19542230 | [1997/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0773645 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0773645 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773645 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/14, H04Q11/04 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
H04J3/14 (EP);
H04J2203/006 (EP);
H04J2203/0094 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/20] | H04J3/14 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Auswahl von verketteten Signalen aus Empfangssignalen der Synchron-Digital-Hierarchie | [1997/20] | English: | Method for selecting concatenated signals of a received signal of SDH | [1997/20] | French: | Méthode de sélection de signaux concaténés à partir d'un signal reçu selon la hiérarchie numérique synchrone (SDH) | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 15.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 21.03.2006 | [2006/27] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5386418 (KOMURO YASUKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,6 * column 1, lines 9-12 * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 5 * * column 5, lines 21-68 *; | [A]US5151902 (GRALLERT HANS-JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 4,5 * column 1, lines 8-21 * * column 2, lines 33-51 * * column 4, lines 25-31 * * column 5, lines 1-6 *; | [A]US5257261 (PARRUCK BIDYUT [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 14-19 * * column 5, lines 46-65 * * column 13, lines 55-68 *; | [A]JPH0537598 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930623), vol. 017, no. 331, Database accession no. (E - 1386), & JP05037598 A 19930212 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0429888 |