EP0773508 - Apparatus for extracting fingerprint features [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uchida, Kaoru NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/20] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117512.2 | 31.10.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | JP19950289460 | 08.11.1995 Original published format: JP 28946095 | [1997/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0773508 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0773508 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773508 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
G06V40/1347 (EP,US);
G06V40/1359 (KR);
G06V10/507 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/20] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Extraktion von Fingerabdruckmerkmalen | [1997/20] | English: | Apparatus for extracting fingerprint features | [1997/20] | French: | Appareil pour extraire des caractéristiques d'empreintes digitales | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/46] | 03.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JPH01271883 | JPH01271884 | JPH03108075 | JPH0779033 |