EP0772965 - Liquid manure distributor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fliegl, Josef Maierhof 1 84556 Kastl / DE | [1997/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Seidel, Herta Siedlungsstrasse 3 84494 Lohkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Seidel, Herta, Dipl.-Phys. Siedlungsstrasse 3 84494 Lohkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117701.1 | 05.11.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | DE1995217792U | 09.11.1995 Original published format: DE 29517792 U | DE1996201934U | 08.02.1996 Original published format: DE 29601934 U | DE1996209874U | 04.06.1996 Original published format: DE 29609874 U | DE1996217277U | 07.10.1996 Original published format: DE 29617277 U | [1997/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0772965 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A01C23/00 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
A01C23/003 (EP);
A01C23/006 (EP);
A01C23/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, NL [1997/20] | Title | German: | Gülleverteiler | [1997/20] | English: | Liquid manure distributor | [1997/20] | French: | Distributeur de purin | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 16.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/18] | 27.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.02.2001 | 30.11.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8802176U (LATZ) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,15,16,35 * page 5, paragraph 6 - page 8; figures 1-3 *; | [A]CH98240 (ALFRED GUBLER GUTSVERWALTUNG R [CH]) [A] 24,25 * the whole document *; | [A]NL8600904 (KAMPS DE WILD B V) [A] 32-34 * page 2, line 1 - page 4; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE2035263 (S.A. FERMATIC) [A] 1,2,4,5 * page 8, line 2 - page 19; figures 1-15 *; | [A]FR2548859 (BUREL SA ETS F [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,5,15,18 * the whole document *; | [XP]DE29601934U (FLIEGL JOSEF [DE]) [XP] 1-7,9-14,20-23 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4313326 |