EP0783070 - Clamping device for mounting glass plates, especially glass plates made of safety glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWS Gesellschaft für Glasbaubeschläge mbH Friedrich-Engels-Strasse 12 51545 Waldbröl / DE | [2001/22] |
Former [1997/28] | For all designated states SWS Gesellschaft für Glasbaubeschläge mbH Brölstrasse 60 51545 Waldbröl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Jürgen, Dipl.-Kfm. Herrmann-Löns-Weg 19 51580 Reichshof / DE | 02 /
Schmitz, Hans Dieter Im Schmitzgarten 5 53809 Ruppichteroth / DE | [1997/28] | Representative(s) | Schwarz, Klaus-Jürgen Rondorfer Strasse 5A 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/28] | Schwarz, Klaus-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Gluckstrasse 7 53115 Bonn / DE | Application number, filing date | 96117862.1 | 07.11.1996 | [1997/28] | Priority number, date | DE1995141810 | 09.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19541810 | DE1996200746U | 17.01.1996 Original published format: DE 29600746 U | [1997/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0783070 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0783070 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | [1997/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0783070 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/00, E04F11/18 | [1997/28] | CPC: |
E06B3/5481 (EP);
E04C2/54 (EP);
E04F11/1851 (EP);
E04F11/1853 (EP);
E06B1/38 (EP);
F16B2/245 (EP);
E04F2011/1831 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/28] | Title | German: | Klemvorrichtungen zum Befestigen von Glasplatten, insbesondere von Glasplatten aus Verbundsicherheitsglas | [1997/28] | English: | Clamping device for mounting glass plates, especially glass plates made of safety glass | [1997/28] | French: | Dispositif de fixation par serrage pour la fixation de plaques de verre, surtout les plaques de verre fabriquées de verre de sécurité | [1997/28] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 14.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 30.05.2001 | IE | 30.05.2001 | PT | 30.08.2001 | SE | 30.08.2001 | GR | 31.08.2001 | MC | 07.11.2001 | ES | 30.11.2001 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/04] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
PT | 30.08.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
MC | 07.11.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
PT | 30.08.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
MC | 07.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/43] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
PT | 30.08.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
MC | 07.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
PT | 30.08.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 30.08.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3337759 (BLEFA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4,6,18,19* page 7, line 25 - page 9, line 37; figure . *; | [A]DE9318761U (SWS GLASBAUBESCHLAEGE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,7,11-13,18,25 * page 4, line 19 - page 6, line 12; figures 1-13 * | by applicant | DE9318761U |