EP0772994 - Dishwashing machine with improved hydraulic circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merloni Elettrodomestici S.p.A. Viale Aristide Merloni, 47 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT | [2002/15] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI S.p.A. Viale Aristide Merloni, 45 I-60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marchitto, Giuseppe Via Citta di Gap 16 10064 Pinerolo (TO) / IT | 02 /
Roncati, Fabio Via de Gasperi 49 15100 Alessandria (AL) / IT | [1997/20] | Application number, filing date | 96117864.7 | 07.11.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | IT1995TO00909 | 10.11.1995 Original published format: IT TO950909 | [1997/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0772994 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0772994 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/23 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
A47L15/23 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1997/20] | Title | German: | Hydaulikkreislauf für eine Geschirrspülmaschine | [1997/20] | English: | Dishwashing machine with improved hydraulic circuit | [1997/20] | French: | Circuit hydraulique pour machine à laver la vaisselle | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/03] | 14.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Request for further processing for: | 17.12.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.01.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU963135 ; | [A]US5449011 (JACOBUS DWIGHT W [US], et al) [A] 1,11* column 4, line 54 - line 61; figure 1 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (19871223), vol. 87, no. 50, Database accession no. 87354089, XP002013289 & SU963135 A 19870507 [A] 1,11 * abstract * | Examination | SU1308314 |