EP0775476 - Slit sleeve wrist support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [2002/30] |
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 D-20245 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiesemann, Sidney Michael 3640 Tarpis Avenue, Apt. 18 Cincinnati, Ohio 45208 / US | 02 /
Hinds, Sherry Ann 1760 Liberty Woods Drive Goshen, Ohio 45122 / US | [1997/22] | Application number, filing date | 96118070.0 | 12.11.1996 | [1997/22] | Priority number, date | US19950561723 | 22.11.1995 Original published format: US 561723 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0775476 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0775476 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/01 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
A61F5/0118 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1997/22] | Title | German: | Geschlitzte Handgelenksstützmanschette | [1997/22] | English: | Slit sleeve wrist support | [1997/22] | French: | Support de poignet à manchon fendu | [1997/22] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 09.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4854309 (DENISE MUFFLY ELSEY [US]) [Y] 1-11 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5014689 (MEUNCHEN PAUL K [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US4944766 (WILLIAMS BRIAN R [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 1 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]AU5682886 (ORTHOPAEDIC APPLIANCES PTY) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US4883073 (AZIZ FAROOQ [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0162610 (SPENCER BANBURY LTD [GB]) |