EP0774311 - Apparatus and method for producing a core [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SINTOKOGIO, LTD. 7-23, Meieki 4-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi Prefecture / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states SINTOKOGIO, LTD. 7-23, 4-chome, Meieki, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi Prefecture / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uzaki, Nagato 100-8, Higashihowa, Yayoi-cho Toyohashi-shi, Aichi Pref. / JP | 02 /
Kasazaki, Masayoshi 412, Akasakadai, Otowa-cho Hoi-gun, Aichi Pref. / JP | 03 /
Harada, Hisashi 4-18, Aza-oburo, Oaza-Ichinomiya Ichinomiya-cho, Hoi-gun, Aichi-Pref. / JP | 04 /
Sugimoto, Kazuo 68, Ushiroda, Goyu-cho Toyokawa-shi, Aichi Pref. / JP | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96118272.2 | 14.11.1996 | [1997/21] | Priority number, date | JP19950323660 | 17.11.1995 Original published format: JP 32366095 | JP19960061985 | 23.02.1996 Original published format: JP 6198596 | [1997/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0774311 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B22C15/24 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
B22C15/24 (EP);
B22C9/123 (EP);
H01F41/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1997/21] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kernes | [1997/21] | English: | Apparatus and method for producing a core | [1997/21] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la production d'un noyau | [1997/21] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 28.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0123756 (NANIWA PRODUCTS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 3; figure 1 *; | [Y]CH612605 (GEORG FISCHER AG) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9315614U (HOTTINGER ADOLF MASCH [DE]) [A] 10-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0443287 (NANIWA PRODUCTS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | JPS4813804B |