EP0780801 - Method and devices for using and billing of electronic payment means in an open and interoperable system for automatic fee charging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states First Data Deutschland GmbH Konrad-Adenauer-Allee 1 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE | [2007/34] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states GZS Gesellschaft für Zahlungssysteme mbH Konrad-Adenauer-Allee 1 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE | ||
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states GZS Gesellschaft für Zahlungssysteme mbH Konrad-Adenauer-Allee 1 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE | ||
Former [1997/26] | For all designated states GZS Gesellschaft für Zahlungssysteme mbH Theodor-Heuss-Allee 80 60486 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolfart, Peter Altkönigstrasse 8a 61267 Neu-Anspach / DE | 02 /
Alles, Peter, Dr. Wilhelm-Leuschner-Strasse 14 65824 Schwalbach / DE | [1997/26] | Representative(s) | Maiwald, Walter, et al Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | Maiwald, Walter, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/26] | Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Maiwald & Partner, Poccistrasse 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96118760.6 | 22.11.1996 | [1997/26] | Priority number, date | WO1995EP05019 | 19.12.1995 Original published format: PCT/EP95/05019 | [1997/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0780801 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0780801 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G07B15/00, G07F7/10 | [1997/26] | CPC: |
G06Q20/14 (EP);
G06Q20/352 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3226 (EP);
G06Q20/363 (EP);
G07B15/00 (EP);
G07B15/063 (EP);
G07F7/0866 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/26] | Extension states | AL | 22.11.1996 | LT | 22.11.1996 | LV | 22.11.1996 | RO | 22.11.1996 | SI | 22.11.1996 | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtungen für die Verwendung und Verrechnung von elektronischen Zahlungsmitteln in einem offenen und interoperablen System zur automatischen Gebührenerhebung | [1997/26] | English: | Method and devices for using and billing of electronic payment means in an open and interoperable system for automatic fee charging | [1997/26] | French: | Procédé et dispositifs pour l'utilisation et la facturation de moyens de paiement électroniques dans un système ouvert et interopérable pour la taxation automatique de frais | [1997/26] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/29] | 16.07.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 13.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.03.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 25.04.2007 | IE | 25.04.2007 | NL | 25.04.2007 | GR | 26.07.2007 | LU | 22.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2008/29] | DK | 25.04.2007 | |
IE | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | DK | 25.04.2007 | |
IE | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | DK | 25.04.2007 | |
IE | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 25.04.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4303904 (CHASEK NORMAN E); | [AD]EP0152198 (SCHLUMBERGER ELECTRONICS UK [GB]) [AD] 1,4-6 * column A; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4578530 (ZEIDLER HOWARD M [US]); | [AD]EP0401192 (BAETS THIERRY DE [BE]) [AD] 1-6,8,14-16,30-40,43,48-55 * abstract * * page 3, line 2 - page 8, line 8 * * page 9, line 48 - page 10, line 21 * * page 12, line 56 - page 13, line 58 * * page 16, line 4 - line 58 *; | [AD]WO9118354 (HASSETT JOHN J [US], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]WO9309621 (LEE KWANG SIL [KR]); | [A]EP0542297 (MOBA ELECTRONIC MOBIL AUTOMAT [DE]) [A] 1,2,4-6,16-22 * page 2, line 56 - page 5, line 16; figure - *; | [AD]EP0577328 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [AD] 1-6,8,18,19,48,51-54 * column A; figure -; claim - * * column 4, line 34 - column 14, line 34 *; | [AD]EP0609453 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]); | [AD]EP0616302 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-6,48 * column A; figure -; claim - *; | [AD]GB2278704 (CUTTS DAVID JOHN [GB]); | [AD]WO9510147 (AMTECH CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1-6,8,14-33,48-51,54-57 * page 5, line 13 - page 9, line 26 * * page 11, line 15 - page 12, line 13 * * page 22, line 21 - page 62, line 10; figure - *; | [AD]US5450087 (HURTA DWAINE S [US], et al) [AD] 1-6,18,19,34,48-57 * column A; figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9530211 (CITIBANK NA [US]) [A] 1,2,4-6,16-22 * abstract * | by applicant | US4303904 | EP0152198 | EP0401192 | WO9118354 | WO9309621 | EP0577328 | EP0609453 | EP0616302 | GB2278704 | WO9510147 | US5450087 |