EP0780123 - Beta-hydroxybutyric acid or acetoacetic acid or salts or esters therof for use in improving cerebral function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 10 Fleet Place, Limeburner Lane London EC4M 7SB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 10 Fleet Place, Limeburner Lane London EC4M 7SB / GB | ||
Former [1997/26] | For all designated states Shimizu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 235, Miyakami Shimizu-shi, Shizuoka 424 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiraide, Atsushi, M.D. 1-7-19-206, Shibahara-cho Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560 / JP | 02 /
Dohi, Sekiko, Ph.D. Shimizu-Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., 235, Miyakami Shimizu-shi, Shizuoka 424 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Motohisa Shimizu-Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., 235, Miyakami Shimizu-shi, Shizuoka 424 / JP | 04 /
Shiba, Yoshihiro Shimizu-Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., 235, Miyakami Shimizu-shi, Shizuoka 424 / JP | [1997/26] | Representative(s) | Weisert, Annekäte, et al Patentanwälte Kraus & Weisert Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/26] | Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96118764.8 | 22.11.1996 | [1997/26] | Priority number, date | JP19950337750 | 01.12.1995 Original published format: JP 33775095 | JP19960202671 | 31.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20267196 | JP19960202676 | 01.08.1996 Original published format: JP 20267696 | JP19960299247 | 24.10.1996 Original published format: JP 29924796 | [1997/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0780123 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0780123 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/191, A61K31/22 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1997/26] | A61K31/19, A61K31/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/26] | Title | German: | Betahydroxybuttersäure oder Acetoessigsäure oder deren Salze oder Ester zur Verwendung zur Verbesserung der Gehirnfunktion | [1997/26] | English: | Beta-hydroxybutyric acid or acetoacetic acid or salts or esters therof for use in improving cerebral function | [1997/26] | French: | L'acide bêta-hydroxybutyrique ou l'acide acétoacétique ou leurs sels ou esters pour l'utilisation dans l'amélioration du fonctionnement cérébral | [1997/26] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/07] | 20.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.04.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01122563.8 / EP1188437 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]RU2007168 ; | [Y]JPS57183748 ; | [Y]US4346107 (CAVAZZA CLAUDIO, et al) [Y] 1-6* column 2, line 17 - line 48 *; | [X]GB2126082 (SCHULZE HEINRICH, et al) [X] 1-6 * page 1, line 79 - page 2, line 68; claims 1,5,6 *; | [X]US5116868 (CHEN CHUNG-HO [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * claims 1,5 *; | [X] - ALBERT S.Y.CHANG ET AL., "Hypoxia and beta-hydroxybutyrate acutely reduce glucose extraction by the brain in anesthetized dogs", CAN.J.PHYSIOL.PHARMACOL., (1993), vol. 71, no. 7, pages 465 - 472, XP000652713 [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 465, column L * * page 470, column R, paragraph 4 * | [Y] - CLAUDIA ROBERTSON ET AL., "Dietary nonprotein calories and cerebral infarction size in rats", STROKE, (1992), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 564 - 568, XP000652742 [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * page 564, column R * * page 568, column L, paragraph 1 * | [Y] - BENDIKOV ET AL., "Effect of sodium hydroxybutyrate on cerebral circulation and regional vasomotor reflexes", MEDLINE, Knight-Ridder, XP002029059 [Y] 1-6 * abstract * | [ ] - BIULL.EKSP.BIOL.MED., (1979), vol. 88, no. 11, pages 555 - 557 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 33, Database accession no. 94-270349, XP002029060 & RU2007168 C 19940215 (KIRG MED INST) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 51, Database accession no. 82-10255J, XP002029061 & JPS57183748 A 19821112 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * | [Y] - ALAN A. ARTRU ET AL., "gamma-hydroxybutyrate: cerebral metabolic, vascular, and protective effects", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, (1980), vol. 35, no. 5, pages 1114 - 1119, XP000652714 [Y] 1-6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1471-4159.1980.tb07866.x | by applicant | JPS58201746 | - OWEN ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1967), vol. 46, no. 10, pages 1589 - 1595 | - FUJII ET AL., JPN. J. ACUTE MED., (1993), vol. 4, no. 5, page 484 |