EP0777246 - Electrical switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marquardt GmbH Schlossstrasse 16 78604 Rietheim-Weilheim / DE | [1997/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kizele, Rainer Kolpingweg 39 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | ||
Former [1997/23] | Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten & Roth Seestrasse 42 88214 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96118968.5 | 27.11.1996 | [1997/23] | Priority number, date | DE1995144702 | 30.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19544702 | [1997/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0777246 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0777246 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777246 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/58, H01H13/20 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
H01H13/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/23] | H01H13/58 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/23] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Schalter | [1997/23] | English: | Electrical switch | [1997/23] | French: | Interrupteur électrique | [1997/23] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 09.01.2003 | ES | 29.04.2003 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/27] | SE | 09.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE480911 (HUGO KRIEGER FA) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 27 - line 51 *; | [A]DE1011751 (KOSTAL FA LEOPOLD) [A] 1 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 20 *; | [A]DE443930 (SIEMENS SCHUCKERTWERKE GMBH) [A] 1; | [A]FR1355599 (CEM COMP ELECTRO MEC) [A] 1 * page 2, column 2 - page 3, column 1; figure - * |