EP0782213 - Radio station with a separate antenna unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Korte, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Reitmorstrasse 43 80538 München / DE | 02 /
Eul, Hermann, Dr. Ing. Hirschplanallee 7 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE | [1997/27] | Application number, filing date | 96119166.5 | 28.11.1996 | [1997/27] | Priority number, date | DE1995147288 | 18.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19547288 | [1997/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0782213 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0782213 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0782213 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H04B1/48, H01Q1/32, H04B1/38 | [1997/27] | CPC: |
H04B1/3877 (EP);
H04B1/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | GB, IT, SE [1997/27] | Title | German: | Funkstation mit einer abgesetzten Antenneneinheit | [1997/27] | English: | Radio station with a separate antenna unit | [1997/27] | French: | Station radioélectrique avec une unité d'antenne séparée | [1997/27] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 17.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0447614 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [X]WO9519097 (PETERSON DANNY R [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11 * abstract *; | [X]DE4405885 (FUNKWERK DABENDORF GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,11 * the whole document * | by applicant | - Handbuch fuer Hochfrequenz- und Elektrotechniker., HEIDELBERG., HUETHIG VERLAG., (1980), vol. 4, pages 598-600 - 618-622 |