EP0778018 - Spoon-shaped peel-off container for the administration of single premeasured doses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dompé S.P.A. Via Campo di Pile I-67100 L'Aquila / IT | [1997/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boltri, Luigi Via Campo di Pile 67100 L'Aquila / IT | 02 /
Cassandri, Rocco Via Campo di Pile 67100 L'Aquila / IT | 03 /
Clavenna, Gaetano Via Campo di Pile 67100 L'Aquila / IT | 04 /
Gentile, Marco Via Campo di Pile 67100 L'Aquila / IT | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | Minoja, Fabrizio Studio Consulenza Brevettuale, Via Rossini, 8 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96119286.1 | 02.12.1996 | [1997/24] | Priority number, date | IT1995MI02565 | 06.12.1995 Original published format: IT MI952565 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0778018 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61J7/00, B65D75/32, B65D75/34, A47G21/04 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
B65D75/32 (EP);
A47G21/004 (EP);
A61J7/0023 (EP);
A61J7/0046 (EP);
B65D75/326 (EP);
B65D75/327 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/24] | Extension states | AL | 19.12.1996 | LT | 19.12.1996 | LV | 19.12.1996 | RO | 19.12.1996 | SI | 19.12.1996 | Title | German: | Löffelförmiger Behälter mit abziehbarer Deckelfolie zur Verabreichung definierter Einzeldosen | [1997/24] | English: | Spoon-shaped peel-off container for the administration of single premeasured doses | [1997/24] | French: | Récipient pelable en forme de cuillère pour l'administration de doses individuelles pré-mesurées | [1997/24] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/13] | 19.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2063745 (THEVENIN JEAN) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 4 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]CH665819 (ALUSUISSE) [A] 3-8 * page 2, column R, line 56 - page 3, column L, line 8 * * page 3, column L, line 24 - page 3, column L, line 33 * * page 3, column L, line 48 - page 3, column R, line 45 ** figures 1-6 *; | [X]FR2697331 (LANGLOIS MARC [FR]) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 3 * * page 2, line 18 - page 2, line 29 * * page 3, line 10 - page 3, line 11 * * page 4, line 16 - page 4, line 25 * * figure 1 * |