EP0778313 - Acrylic rubber composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOK CORPORATION 1-12-15, Shibadaimon, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-City Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states NOK Corporation 1-12-15, Shibadaimon, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City Aichi-Pref. 448 / JP | |||
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states Nok Corporation 12-15, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo-to / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City Aichi-Pref. 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikuni, Kenji 991-19-409, Fujisawa Fujisawa city, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Nagaoka, Hisayuki 904, Ishinari, Higashiseburi village Kanzaki county, Saga / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Norio 6-21-9, Hanazonocho Handa city, Aichi / JP | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96119546.8 | 05.12.1996 | [1997/24] | Priority number, date | JP19950345770 | 08.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34577095 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0778313 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0778313 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/5317, C08L33/08, C09K3/10 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
C09K3/10 (EP,US);
C08K5/5317 (EP,US);
C09K2200/0417 (EP,US);
C09K2200/0488 (EP,US);
C09K2200/0625 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/5317, C08L33/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/24] | Title | German: | Acrylkautschukzusammensetzung | [1997/24] | English: | Acrylic rubber composition | [1997/24] | French: | Composition de caoutchouc acrylique | [1997/24] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/29] | 24.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4343057 (NOK CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US3976610 (MORRIS ROGER E, et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [PX]JPH0841271 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD) [PX] 1-10; | JPH0841271 [ ] | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 96, no. 002, & JP08041271 A 00000000 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO) [ ] * abstract * | by applicant | JPH05148476 |